Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius Balina

Deceased

Bishop of Shinyanga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1945BornIsoso
27 Jun 197126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Shinyanga, Tanzania
8 Nov 198439.4AppointedBishop of Geita, Tanzania
6 Jan 198539.5Ordained BishopBishop of Geita, Tanzania
8 Aug 199752.1AppointedBishop of Shinyanga, Tanzania
6 Nov 201267.4DiedBishop of Shinyanga, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Balina:
Bishop Aloysius Balina (born , died ) Bishop of Shinyanga

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 May 2014