Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Andrzej Maria Cardinal Deskur

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications

Cardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1924BornSancygniów, Poland
20 Aug 195026.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
9 Jan 197045.9AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications
Sep 197349.5AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications
17 Jun 197450.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thenae
30 Jun 197450.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thenae
15 Feb 198056.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thenae
15 Feb 198056.0AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications
8 Apr 198460.1RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications
25 May 198561.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
25 May 198561.2Elevated to Cardinal
29 Jan 199671.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio
3 Sep 201187.5DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Maria Deskur:
Cardinal Andrzej Maria Deskur (born , died ) President Emeritus of Social Communications

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
  • a cardinal for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 3 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207
  • ab/sect/xsco: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 62, Page 75
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013