Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi del Gallo Roccagiovine

Deceased

Official Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

Titular Bishop of Camplum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1922BornRoma, Italy
19 Mar 195027.7Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
20 Dec 198260.4AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
20 Dec 198260.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Camplum
6 Jan 198360.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Camplum
1997²74.5RetiredOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
12 May 201188.8DiedOfficial Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi del Gallo Roccagiovine:
Bishop Luigi del Gallo Roccagiovine (born , died ) Official Emeritus of Roman Curia - Other

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 13 May 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013