Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerhard Ludwig Goebel, M.S.F. †

Deceased

Prelate of Troms°


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1933BornScheuerfeld/Sieg
3 Jul 196026.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
29 Mar 197945.3AppointedPrelate of Troms°, Norway
27 May 197945.5Ordained BishopPrelate of Troms°, Norway
4 Nov 200672.9DiedPrelate of Troms°, Norway

MicroData Summary for Gerhard Ludwig Goebel:
Bishop Gerhard Ludwig Goebel M.S.F. (born , died ) Prelate of Troms°

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013