Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Rajappa

Deceased

Bishop of Khammam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1918BornAnekal
19 Dec 194527.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 196748.6AppointedBishop of Kurnool, India
7 Sep 196748.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kurnool, India
18 Jan 198869.2AppointedBishop of Khammam, India
27 Dec 198971.1DiedBishop of Khammam, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Rajappa:
Bishop Joseph Rajappa (born , died ) Bishop of Khammam

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013