Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Lafontaine

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

Titular Bishop of Ursona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1923Born
22 May 194825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
18 Apr 197956.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
18 Apr 197956.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ursona
27 May 197956.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ursona
3 Jun 198158.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Lafontaine
Bishop Jean-Marie Lafontaine (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018