Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Curis

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Canada

Titular Archbishop of Medeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1923BornLa Maddalena, Italy
13 Jul 194723.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jul 197147.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Medeli
14 Jul 197147.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Sri Lanka
3 Oct 197147.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Medeli
10 Feb 197652.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Sri Lanka
30 Mar 197854.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Nigeria
4 Feb 198460.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Cyprus
4 Feb 198460.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Jerusalem and Palestine
28 Mar 199066.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Canada
1 Sep 199470.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Canada
4 Feb 199975.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Canada
29 Sep 201490.9DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Canada

MicroData Summary for Carlo Curis:
Archbishop Carlo Curis (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Canada

  • a priest for 67.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 30 Sep 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015