Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Aelen, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Madras

Titular Archbishop of Nicopolis ad Nestum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1854BornWaspik, Netherlands
21 Dec 187824.0Ordained PriestPriest of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
2 Dec 190146.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madras, India
2 Dec 190146.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Themisonium
2 Feb 190247.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Themisonium
21 Jul 190247.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Madras, India
13 Feb 191156.1SucceededArchbishop of Madras, India
28 Feb 192873.2RetiredArchbishop of Madras, India
28 Feb 192873.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicopolis ad Nestum
11 Feb 192974.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Madras, India

MicroData Summary for John Aelen:
Archbishop John Aelen M.H.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Madras

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 358, and Page 547
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013