Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Paul Prabhu

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Zimbabwe

Titular Archbishop of Tituli in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1931BornChennai, India
20 Dec 195524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India
13 Nov 199362.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Zimbabwe
13 Nov 199362.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tituli in Numidia
6 Jan 199462.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tituli in Numidia
1 Jul 200271.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Zimbabwe
10 Sep 201382.5DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Peter Paul Prabhu:
Archbishop Peter Paul Prabhu (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Zimbabwe

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,185
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: CB, 10 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 12 Sep 2013