Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pius Alick Mvundla Ncube

Archbishop Emeritus of Bulawayo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1946 BornFilabusi
26 Aug 197326.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe
24 Oct 199750.8AppointedArchbishop of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe
25 Jan 199851.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe
11 Sep 200760.7ResignedArchbishop of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Pius Alick Mvundla Ncube:
Archbishop Pius Alick Mvundla Ncube (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bulawayo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bulawayo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Sep 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,226

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Jun 2014