Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dieter Scholz, S.J.

Bishop of Chinhoyi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1938 BornBerlin
15 Apr 195819.9ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
13 Jul 196931.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
6 Apr 200667.8AppointedBishop of Chinhoyi, Zimbabwe
2 Sep 200668.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chinhoyi, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Dieter Scholz:
Bishop Dieter Scholz S.J. (born ) Bishop of Chinhoyi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chinhoyi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,231

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013