Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Hwange

Dioecesis Huangensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 8 April 1988
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bulawayo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Zimbabwe
  • Square Kilometers: 43,427 (16,773 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 25, Old Bulawayo Rd., Hwange, Zimbabwe
  • Telephone: (081)22325
  • Fax: 22260

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Wankie
29 June 1953ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Bulawayo
Vicariate Apostolic of Salisbury
Prefecture Apostolic of Wankie (erected)
Diocese of Wankie
1 March 1963ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Wankie Diocese of Wankie
Diocese of Hwange
8 April 1988Name ChangedDiocese of Wankie Diocese of Hwange
17 June 1991Territory LostDiocese of Hwange Diocese of Gokwe (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Wankie
197019,400290,0006.7%3636538364916ap1971
198037,588494,0007.6%224261,445303817ap1981
Diocese of Hwange
199060,674878,0916.9%1224361,685326424ap1991
199933,114313,52710.6%1116271,226237221ap2000
200033,784321,36510.5%1215271,251216721ap2001
200135,577329,39910.8%1316291,226226022ap2002
200237,048317,30011.7%1119301,234236824ap2003
200337,770323,78011.7%1117281,348226424ap2004
200438,576329,93711.7%1316291,330216024ap2005
200641,118343,26512.0%1714311,326178124ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 2 Nov 2012