Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Alberto Serrano Antón, I.E.M.E.

Bishop of Hwange, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1942 Born
1 Jul 196624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Instituto Español de San Francisco Javier para Misiones Extranjeras
5 Dec 200664.6AppointedBishop of Hwange, Zimbabwe
3 Feb 200764.8Ordained BishopBishop of Hwange, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for José Alberto Serrano Antón
Bishop José Alberto Serrano Antón I.E.M.E. (born ) Bishop of Hwange

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaragoza, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hwange.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,330

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast