Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luciano Pérez Platero

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1882BornArizaleta
22 Dec 190726.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 192947.1AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
9 Jun 192947.4Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
9 Dec 194462.9AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
14 Jun 196381.4DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luciano Pérez Platero:
Archbishop Luciano Pérez Platero (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013