Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eusebius Jelous Nyathi

Bishop of Gokwe, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1974 Born
17 Jun 200429.8Ordained PriestPriest of Hwange, Zimbabwe
23 Jun 202348.8AppointedBishop of Gokwe, Zimbabwe
23 Sep 202349.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gokwe, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Eusebius Jelous Nyathi
Bishop Eusebius Jelous Nyathi (born ) Bishop of Gokwe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHwange, Diocese of Wankie
Ordained BishopIn Front of, Saint Paul's Primary School, Gokwe, Diocese of Gokwe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gokwe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2023
  • ob: CB, 25 Jul 2023
  • c2+: CB, 19 Sep 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 25 Sep 2023