Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francesco Font Garcia, I.E.M.E. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Wankie, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1905Born
195347.4AppointedPrefect of Wankie, Zimbabwe
12 Jul 195650.9ResignedPrefect of Wankie, Zimbabwe
22 Mar 196155.6DiedPrefect Emeritus of Wankie, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Francesco Font Garcia
Father Francesco Font Garcia I.E.M.E. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Wankie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurriana, Archdiocese of Valencia, Spain
Death PlaceSan Benito Abad

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast