Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Chinhoyi

Dioecesis Chinhoyiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Dieter Scholz, S.J., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 28 October 1985
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Harare
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Zimbabwe
  • Square Kilometers: 56,000 (21,630 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 680, 26 Robson Manyika Drive, Chinhoyi, Zimbabwe
  • Telephone: (067)22.562
  • Fax: 22.217

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Sinoia
17 December 1973ErectedArchdiocese of Salisbury Prefecture Apostolic of Sinoia (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Chinhoyi
25 June 1982Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Sinoia Prefecture Apostolic of Chinhoyi
Diocese of Chinhoyi
28 October 1985ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Chinhoyi Diocese of Chinhoyi

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Sinoia
198037,000634,0005.8%20201,8502314116ap1981
Prefecture Apostolic of Chinhoyi
Diocese of Chinhoyi
199048,097899,0005.4%617232,0912257116ap1991
199969,2081,829,2083.8%1611272,5632199216ap2000
200069,8531,769,8533.9%1911302,328298816ap2001
200168,0001,828,0003.7%1912312,1932198716ap2002
200269,0001,882,0003.7%209292,3792159716ap2003
200371,0001,771,0004.0%1910292,4482158217ap2004
200479,1011,679,1014.7%2110312,5512167618ap2005
200684,0741,904,0744.4%158233,6552127318ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 2 Nov 2012