Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Kelly

Deceased

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1779Born
18 Jul 180223.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 182041.2AppointedBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
24 Aug 182041.3Ordained BishopBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
19 Jan 182141.7InstalledBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
22 Feb 182242.8AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
8 Oct 182950.4DiedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Kelly
Bishop Patrick Kelly (born , died ) Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilkenny, Co. Kilkenny
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Church, Kilkenny, Co. Kilkenny
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Waterford, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore

  • a priest for 27.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 400, and Page 323
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 38
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Aug 2020

Quantcast