Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frederick John Conrad Résé (Reze)

Deceased

Bishop of Detroit, Michigan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1791BornVienenberg, Germany
15 Mar 182332.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 183342.0AppointedBishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
6 Oct 183342.6Ordained BishopBishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
30 Dec 187180.8DiedBishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Frederick John Conrad Résé (Reze) (VIAF: 10195841)
Bishop Frederick John Conrad Résé (Reze) (born , died ) Bishop of Detroit

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 175
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Aug 2016