Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eduard Profittlich, S.J. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Estonia

Titular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1890BornBirresdorf, Germany
27 Aug 192232.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
11 May 193140.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Estonia
27 Nov 193646.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
27 Dec 193646.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
22 Feb 194251.4DiedApostolic Administrator of Estonia

MicroData Summary for Eduard Profittlich:
Archbishop Eduard Profittlich S.J. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Estonia

  • a priest for 19.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,901
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013