Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciscus Antonius Hubertus Boermans

Deceased

Bishop of Roermond


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1815BornVenlo
22 Dec 183823.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 188569.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands
5 May 188569.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
30 Jun 188569.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
18 Jun 188670.5SucceededBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
3 Feb 190084.1DiedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Franciscus Antonius Hubertus Boermans:
Bishop Franciscus Antonius Hubertus Boermans (born , died ) Bishop of Roermond

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 488, and Page 548

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013