Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerulfus Kherubim Pareira, S.V.D.

Bishop of Maumere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1941 BornLela
15 Aug 197028.9ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
22 Aug 197129.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
21 Dec 198544.2AppointedBishop of Weetebula, Indonesia
25 Apr 198644.6Ordained BishopBishop of Weetebula, Indonesia
19 Jan 200866.3AppointedBishop of Maumere, Indonesia
25 Apr 200866.6InstalledBishop of Maumere, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Gerulfus Kherubim Pareira:
Bishop Gerulfus Kherubim Pareira S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Maumere

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maumere.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2008
  • i: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013