Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hubertus Leteng

Bishop Emeritus of Ruteng, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1959 Born
29 Jul 198829.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ruteng, Indonesia
7 Nov 200950.8AppointedBishop of Ruteng, Indonesia
14 Apr 201051.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ruteng, Indonesia
11 Oct 201758.7ResignedBishop of Ruteng, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Hubertus Leteng (VIAF: 147995628)
Bishop Hubertus Leteng (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ruteng

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaga
Ordained BishopMotang Rua, Ruteng, Diocese of Ruteng

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ruteng.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,622
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018