Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincentius Sensi Potokota

Archbishop of Ende


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1951 BornSaga
11 May 198028.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 200554.4AppointedBishop of Maumere, Indonesia
23 Apr 200654.8Ordained BishopBishop of Maumere, Indonesia
14 Apr 200755.8AppointedArchbishop of Ende, Indonesia
7 Jun 200755.9InstalledArchbishop of Ende, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Vincentius Sensi Potokota:
Archbishop Vincentius Sensi Potokota (born ) Archbishop of Ende

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ende.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,138
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2007
  • i: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013