Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bandung

Dioecesis Bandungensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 3 January 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Jakarta
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 24,449 (9,443 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://keuskupanbandung.org/
  • Mailing Address: Keuskupan, Jl. Jawa 26, Bandung 40013, Jawa, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (022)420.45.37
  • Fax: 421.39.92

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Bandung
20 April 1932ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of Bandung (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bandung
16 October 1941ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Bandung Vicariate Apostolic of Bandung
Diocese of Bandung
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bandung Diocese of Bandung

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bandung
195016,5706,532,457.3%128295719137ap1951
Diocese of Bandung
197028,79611,065,330.3%3363973844171ap1971
198042,32115,340,000.3%1525379887135ap1981
199065,15017,915,000.4%456601,08513112972ap1991
199983,17026,000,000.3%1462761,09420813568ap2000
200090,93919,900,000.5%1667831,09521016062ap2001
200188,26324,000,000.4%1859771,14616714663ap2002
200294,56925,000,000.4%2060801,18218414765ap2003
200396,95425,000,000.4%2167881,10119214165ap2004
200496,86435,000,000.3%2056761,27414715665ap2005
2006102,03540,000,000.3%2753801,27511315965ap2007
201287,24727,018,000.3%347210682313915323ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 1 Oct 2014