Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelmus Adrianus Josephus Maria de Bekker

Bishop Emeritus of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1939 Born
25 May 198546.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles
12 Nov 200465.5AppointedBishop of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles
30 Jan 200565.7Ordained BishopBishop of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles
31 May 201475.0RetiredBishop of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Wilhelmus Adrianus Josephus Maria de Bekker
Bishop Wilhelmus Adrianus Josephus Maria de Bekker (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Paramaribo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHelmond, Netherlands

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Paramaribo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,815
  • r: Bollettino, 31 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018