Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Martinus van der Weijden

Deceased

Prefect of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1800Born
9 Aug 182525.6Ordained PriestPriest
Feb 182626.1AppointedPrefect of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles
14 Oct 182626.8DiedPrefect of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Martinus van der Weijden:
Priest Martinus van der Weijden (died ) Prefect of Dutch Guyana-Suriname

  • a priest for 1.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013