Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henricus den Dubbelden

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

Titular Bishop of Emmaüs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1769BornAsten
5 Jun 183161.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
14 Jan 184272.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
10 Apr 184272.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
13 Oct 185181.8DiedVicar Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Henricus den Dubbelden (VIAF: 289219370)
Bishop Henricus den Dubbelden (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1843
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 122, and Page 187
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Nov 2016