Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frédéric Cao Sanna, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ava e Pegù, Myanmar

Titular Bishop of Zama Major


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1784Born
18 Jun 183045.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Pegù, Myanmar
18 Jun 183045.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Zama Major
20 Jun 183045.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zama Major
24 Apr 183853.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Malacca, Singapore
11 Jul 184156.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Pegù, Myanmar
11 Jul 184156.7ResignedApostolic Administrator of Malacca, Singapore
27 Jun 185267.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Pegù, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Frédéric Cao Sanna
Bishop Frédéric Cao Sanna Sch. P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ava e Pegù

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGonnoscodina

  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 601
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 401
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 19
  • m368: CB, 26 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast