Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Bussi

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1755BornViterbo
25 May 178227.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Sep 178227.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 182469.3AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
3 May 182469.3Elevated to Cardinal
3 May 182469.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
23 May 182469.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
31 Jan 184489.0DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Bussi:
Cardinal Giovanni Battista Bussi (born , died ) Archbishop of Benevento

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
  • a cardinal for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 109

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013