Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Pedicini

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1813Born
19 Sep 183522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Benevento, Italy
17 Jul 185441.4SelectedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
23 Mar 185542.1ConfirmedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
25 Mar 185542.1Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
27 Sep 185845.6AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
6 Jun 188673.3DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Pedicini (VIAF: 59889061)
Archbishop Francesco Pedicini (born , died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFogliano, Archdiocese of Benevento
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 141, and Page 391
  • c34: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 28 Dec 2016