Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccola Belletti

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1782Born
15 Mar 183048.0AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
21 Mar 183048.0Ordained BishopBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
19 Jun 184361.3AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
21 Sep 186482.5DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccola Belletti (VIAF: 88822682)
Bishop Niccola Belletti (born , died ) Bishop of Foligno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesena

  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 83, and Page 199
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast