Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felicissimo Salvini

Deceased

Archbishop of Camerino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1803³Born
11 Mar 182622.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 184339.9AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
25 Jun 184339.9Ordained BishopBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
12 Apr 184743.7AppointedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
23 Jan 189389.5DiedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felicissimo Salvini
Archbishop Felicissimo Salvini (born , died ) Archbishop of Camerino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNocera
Ordained BishopSant’Andrea delle Fratte, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 66.8 years
  • a bishop for 49.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 176
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 83
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1843, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017