Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Paolo Spoglia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Comacchio

Titular Bishop of Comana Armeniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1816BornPiperno
10 Apr 184125.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 186044.1AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
25 Mar 186044.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
18 Dec 186347.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Montefiascone, Italy
27 Mar 186751.1AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
15 Sep 187963.6ResignedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
22 Sep 187963.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
13 Feb 188771.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Comacchio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Paolo Spoglia:
Bishop Alessandro Paolo Spoglia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Comacchio

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 217, and Page 218
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 393, and Page 483

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013