Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Mariotti

Deceased

Bishop of Montefeltro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1818Born
18 Sep 184123.4Ordained PriestPriest of Montefeltro, Italy
23 Mar 186041.9AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
25 Mar 186041.9Ordained BishopBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
4 Apr 189072.0DiedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Mariotti (VIAF: 89215501)
Bishop Luigi Mariotti (born , died ) Bishop of Montefeltro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaciano, Diocese of Montefeltro
Ordained BishopSte Marie in Transpontine, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017