Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Valerio Laspro

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1827Born
16 Mar 185022.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Oct 185932.2SelectedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
23 Mar 186032.6ConfirmedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
25 Mar 186032.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
6 May 187244.7AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
20 Mar 187749.6AppointedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
22 Sep 191487.1DiedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy

MicroData Summary for Valerio Laspro (VIAF: 88615017)
Archbishop Valerio Laspro (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalvano
Ordained BishopSte Marie in Transpontine, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 54.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 280, and Page 342
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 492
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017