Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Maggi

Deceased

Bishop of Arezzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1762BornLivorno
20 Dec 178826.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 182764.7AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
16 Apr 182764.7Ordained BishopBishop of Arezzo, Italy
3 Apr 183976.7DiedBishop of Arezzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Maggi:
Bishop Sebastiano Maggi (born , died ) Bishop of Arezzo

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013