Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista Guerra

Deceased

Bishop of Bertinoro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1778BornRavenna
14 Jun 180122.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 183051.4AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
21 Mar 183051.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
4 Jul 1857³78.7DiedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Guerra (VIAF: 88826679)
Bishop Giambattista Guerra (born , died ) Bishop of Bertinoro

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1856
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1830, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jul 2016