Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Maria Cardinal Velzi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1767BornComo
1789¹21.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Jul 183265.3AppointedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
2 Jul 183265.3Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jul 183265.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
15 Jul 183265.4Ordained BishopBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
23 Nov 183669.7DiedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Velzi:
Cardinal Giuseppe Maria Velzi O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
  • a cardinal for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013