Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio Valdespino y Díaz

Deceased

Bishop of Aguascalientes, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1861Born
20 Dec 188423.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 190241.1AppointedBishop of Sonora, México
19 Oct 190241.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sonora, México
8 Nov 190241.2InstalledBishop of Sonora, México
10 Jan 191351.4AppointedBishop of Aguascalientes, México
10 May 191351.7InstalledBishop of Aguascalientes, México
11 May 192866.7DiedBishop of Aguascalientes, México

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Valdespino y Díaz
Bishop Ignacio Valdespino y Díaz (born , died ) Bishop of Aguascalientes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChalchihuites

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 524
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 41
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,902, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast