Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Quezada Limón

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aguascalientes, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1909Born
25 Jun 193324.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Oct 195142.7AppointedBishop of Aguascalientes, México
8 Dec 195142.9Ordained BishopBishop of Aguascalientes, México
28 Jan 198475.0RetiredBishop of Aguascalientes, México
20 Nov 199384.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Aguascalientes, México

MicroData Summary for Salvador Quezada Limón
Bishop Salvador Quezada Limón (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aguascalientes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYahualica

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1995
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1951, Number 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast