Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Hernández Gallegos

Deceased

Bishop of Tabasco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1912BornEl Lobo
11 Apr 193623.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Feb 196754.7AppointedBishop of Tabasco, México
11 May 196754.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tabasco, México
22 Oct 197361.4DiedBishop of Tabasco, México

MicroData Summary for Antonio Hernández Gallegos:
Bishop Antonio Hernández Gallegos (born , died ) Bishop of Tabasco

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013