Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Rivera y Muñoz

Deceased

Bishop of Querétaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1859BornQuerétaro
19 May 188323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Querétaro, México
14 Nov 190445.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Querétaro, México
14 Nov 190445.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpasia
22 Jan 190545.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carpasia
11 May 190848.9SucceededBishop of Querétaro, México
2 May 191454.8DiedBishop of Querétaro, México

MicroData Summary for Manuel Rivera y Muñoz:
Bishop Manuel Rivera y Muñoz (born , died ) Bishop of Querétaro

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015