Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Segura y Domínguez

Deceased

Bishop of Tepic, Nayarit


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1850BornLeón
8 Jun 187322.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of León, Guanajuato, México
20 Dec 187323.1Ordained PriestPriest of León, Guanajuato, México
6 Aug 190655.7AppointedBishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México
16 Sep 190655.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México
11 Nov 190656.0InstalledBishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México
13 Aug 191867.7DiedBishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México

MicroData Summary for Andrés Segura y Domínguez:
Bishop Andrés Segura y Domínguez (born , died ) Bishop of Tepic

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 57
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 360

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013