Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rutilo Muñoz Zamora

Bishop of Coatzacoalcos, Veracruz, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1951 Born
19 Mar 197725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Veracruz, México
24 Sep 200251.3AppointedBishop of Coatzacoalcos, Veracruz, México
20 Nov 200251.4Ordained BishopBishop of Coatzacoalcos, Veracruz, México

MicroData Summary for Rutilo Muñoz Zamora
Bishop Rutilo Muñoz Zamora (born ) Bishop of Coatzacoalcos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTulictic

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Coatzacoalcos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,281

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018