Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas Martínez Lara

Deceased

Bishop of Matehuala, San Luís Potosí


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1943BornVilla de la Paz
27 Oct 196825.6Ordained PriestPriest of San Luis Potosí, México
5 Oct 200663.5AppointedBishop of Matehuala, San Luís Potosí, México
14 Dec 200663.7Ordained BishopBishop of Matehuala, San Luís Potosí, México
9 Apr 201673.0DiedBishop of Matehuala, San Luís Potosí, México

MicroData Summary for Lucas Martínez Lara
Bishop Lucas Martínez Lara (born , died ) Bishop of Matehuala

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Vatican Information Service
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,296
  • d: CB, 9 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 10 Apr 2016