Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Cortés Contreras

Archbishop of León, Guanajuato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1947 BornLa Luz
26 Oct 197225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
24 Jun 200557.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
24 Jun 200557.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Regiae
24 Aug 200558.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Regiae
10 Jul 200962.0AppointedBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
18 Aug 200962.1InstalledBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
22 Dec 201265.4AppointedArchbishop of León, Guanajuato, México
20 Mar 201365.7InstalledArchbishop of León, Guanajuato, México

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Cortés Contreras:
Archbishop Alfonso Cortés Contreras (born ) Archbishop of León

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of León.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,965
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013