Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Clavel Gil

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of México, Federal District

Titular Bishop of Macomades


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1935 BornTlacotepec
29 Jun 195923.5Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
27 Jun 200165.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
27 Jun 200165.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Macomades
15 Aug 200165.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macomades
28 May 201377.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Francisco Clavel Gil:
Bishop Francisco Clavel Gil (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of México

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of México.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,021
  • r: Bollettino, 28 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015