Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Víctor Manuel Valentín Sánchez Espinosa

Archbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1950 BornTlancualpicán
6 Jun 197626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
2 Mar 200453.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
2 Mar 200453.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ambia
26 Mar 200453.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ambia
5 Feb 200958.7AppointedArchbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
2 Apr 200958.9InstalledArchbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México

MicroData Summary for José Víctor Manuel Valentín Sánchez Espinosa:
Archbishop José Víctor Manuel Valentín Sánchez Espinosa (born ) Archbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,555

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 31 Mar 2014