Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dagoberto Sosa Arriaga

Bishop of Tlapa, Guerrero


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1955 BornLa Loma, Aquixtla
24 Apr 198328.0Ordained PriestPriest of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
24 Feb 201155.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
24 Feb 201155.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gummi in Byzacena
12 Apr 201156.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gummi in Byzacena
23 Feb 201357.9AppointedBishop of Tlapa, Guerrero, México

MicroData Summary for Dagoberto Sosa Arriaga:
Bishop Dagoberto Sosa Arriaga (born ) Bishop of Tlapa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tlapa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,035
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 5 Mar 2014